+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ353ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 068490366
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 068490366
+ − Sponsors (98)
Type:
Primary Sponsor