+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ342ER)
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 047956540
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 047956540
+ − Sponsors (102)
Type:
Primary Sponsor