+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 1, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ334ER)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 966031297
- Consent to introduce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor