+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ326ER)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006505768-E
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 006505768