+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ322ER)
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 021371828-E
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 021371828