+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 10, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ32ER)
On May 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (33-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (33-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N)
On May 4, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 017866708
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (33-Y 0-N)
May 8, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N)
May 4, 2001: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jerrauld C. Jones
Type:
Primary Sponsor