+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ315ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 002971720-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 002971720-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 002971720-S1
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 004959720-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from S. T. w/amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed 004959720