+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ309ER)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12100240D
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12100240D
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor