+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 27, 2000 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 28, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ291ER)
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 006298576-H1
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 006298576-H1
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 006298576-H1
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 003716576
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor