+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ291ER)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 088934476
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 088934476
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor