+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ29ER)
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 985673176
- Prefiled; 01/13/98