+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 048371236-E
- Taken up
- Previous question ordered
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected (36-Y 63-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ285E
- VOTE: (36-Y 63-N)
- Agreed to by House (70-Y 29-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 29-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House (70-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (70-Y 30-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 048371236