+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ277ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD1859450 (HJ277E)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1994: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor