+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ277ER)
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 020921448-E
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 020921448
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor