+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ276ER)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 069405454
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 069405454
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor