+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ268ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor