+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 20, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ261ER)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Title replaced
- Taken up
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 003842876-E
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds (25-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 003842876
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from Tra. w/amds (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor