+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (92-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ26H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103920D-H1
- Taken up
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14103920D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On December 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102134D
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor