+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ257ER)
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 086489312
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 086489312
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor