+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 15, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ255ER)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N)
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 021423211
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2002: Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor