+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ25ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4757160 (HJ25H1)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor