+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ248ER)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 14103001D
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14103001D
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor