+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N)
- Printed as engrossed 960229252-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 960229252
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor