+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ243ER)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 068405254
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 068405254
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor