+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ239ER)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16103738D