+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ231ER)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 968065484-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 968065484-H1
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 968065484-H1
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961027484
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor