+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Rules
- Rereferred to Rules
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute rejected 961892176-H1
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 961892176-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961543485
+ − Vote
February 6, 1996: Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor