+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 2, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ224ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 964501144-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964501144-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 964501144-S1
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 968064144-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 968064144-H1
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 968064144-H1
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 960337144