+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ219ER)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 065727298
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 065727298
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor