+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ212ER)
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 19-N)
- Agreed to by House (81-Y 19-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ212H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062387480-H1
- Taken up
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062387480-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 069855480
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 19-N)
February 13, 2006: Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (121)
Type:
Primary Sponsor