+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ212ER)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10104416D
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10104416D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor