+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ208ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD0533188 (HJ208E)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed