+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ207ER)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 004691604