+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ206ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Title replaced
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD8292188 (HJ206E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed