+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 14, 1996 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 2, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ202ER)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 961898296-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 961898296-H1
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 961898296-H1
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 965622296
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor