+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ200ER)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 14101677D
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14101677D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor