+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Taken up
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104681D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101579D
+ − Vote
January 26, 2010: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor