+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ194ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 5-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (91-Y 5-N)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 10-N)
- Agreed to by House (82-Y 10-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 045120376
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 045120376