+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ192ER)
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12103153D
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12103153D