+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ188ER)
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 020832756-E
- Engrossed by House
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 020832756
- Prefiled; 01/09/02
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor