+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ180ER)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ180E
- Taken up
- Amendments by Del. Saxman agreed to
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 047688496-E
- Agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047688496