+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 047437272-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ179E
- Amendments by Del. Cole agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047437272
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2004: Left in Rules (16-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2004: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor