+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 14100303D
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ178ER)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 19, 2014 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14100303D
+ − Sponsors (137)
Type:
Primary Sponsor