+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ176ER)
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10101208D
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10101208D
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor