+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ171ER)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N)
- Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 10105811D-S1 (93-Y 5-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HJ171S1
- Amendment by Senator Edwards agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105811D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed 10105811D-S1
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ171E
- Amendments by Delegate Tyler agreed to
- Taken up
- Agreed to by House (84-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (84-Y 9-N)
- Printed as engrossed 10104050D-E
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 2-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (11-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 10104050D
- Introduced by request
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N)
March 8, 2010: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (84-Y 9-N)
February 11, 2010: Reported from Rules (12-Y 2-N)
February 2, 2010: Reported from Rules (11-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor