+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ164ER)
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10103259D
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10103259D