+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 13, 1994 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ160ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4776297 (HJ160H1)
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor