+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ160ER)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 14104026D
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104026D
+ − Sponsors (132)
Type:
Primary Sponsor