+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ158ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 3-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 002575880
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: Reported from Rules (14-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor