+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ155ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (9-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from Rules (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor